Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henrique Johannpötter, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bacabal, Maranhão, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1933Born
20 Apr 195925.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
26 Jul 196128.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
7 Dec 198855.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bacabal, Maranhão, Brazil
20 Jan 198955.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Bacabal, Maranhão, Brazil
2 Dec 198956.4SucceededBishop of Bacabal, Maranhão, Brazil
10 Apr 199763.7ResignedBishop of Bacabal, Maranhão, Brazil
19 Jul 201178.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Bacabal, Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Henrique Johannpötter
Bishop Henrique Johannpötter O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bacabal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWarendorf-Milte

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,240
  • d: CB, 20 Jul 2011
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast