Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerardo de Andrade Ponte

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Patos, Paraiba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1924BornFortaleza
8 Dec 194824.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 Feb 197550.1AppointedBishop of Petrolina, Pernambuco, Brazil
17 Aug 197550.7Ordained BishopBishop of Petrolina, Pernambuco, Brazil
5 Dec 198359.0AppointedBishop of Patos, Paraiba, Brazil
8 Aug 200176.6RetiredBishop of Patos, Paraiba, Brazil
25 May 200681.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Patos, Paraiba, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Gerardo de Andrade Ponte:
Bishop Gerardo de Andrade Ponte (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Patos

  • a priest for 57.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015