Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Carlos Melo, C.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1930Born
31 Jul 195525.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
10 Jul 199161.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
10 Jul 199161.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Ceramus
28 Sep 199161.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ceramus
2 Jun 199968.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title), Auxiliary of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
2 Jun 199968.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ceramus
31 May 200069.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil
3 Jul 200272.0SucceededArchbishop of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil
22 Nov 200676.4RetiredArchbishop of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil
30 May 201786.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Carlos Melo
Archbishop José Carlos Melo C.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Maceió

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCodó
Death PlaceMaceió, Archdiocese of Maceió, Alagoas

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Nov 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,648
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 30 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 31 May 2017