Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gianfranco Masserdotti, M.C.C.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Balsas, Maranhão, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1941Born
26 Mar 196624.5Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
22 Nov 199554.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Balsas, Maranhão, Brazil
2 Mar 199654.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Balsas, Maranhão, Brazil
15 Apr 199856.5SucceededBishop of Balsas, Maranhão, Brazil
17 Sep 200665.0DiedBishop of Balsas, Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Gianfranco Masserdotti
Bishop Gianfranco Masserdotti M.C.C.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Balsas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrescia, Diocese of Brescia, Italy

  • a priest for 40.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,690
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast