Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Miguel Fenelon Câmara Filho

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Teresina, Piaui, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1925Born
8 Dec 194823.6Ordained PriestPriest of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil
9 Jan 197044.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil
9 Jan 197044.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Ath Truim
19 Mar 197044.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ath Truim
5 Feb 197448.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil
24 Nov 197651.6SucceededArchbishop of Maceió, Alagoas, Brazil
7 Oct 198459.5AppointedArchbishop of Teresina, Piaui, Brazil
21 Feb 200175.8RetiredArchbishop of Teresina, Piaui, Brazil
28 Jun 201893.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Teresina, Piaui, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Miguel Fenelon Câmara Filho
Archbishop Miguel Fenelon Câmara Filho (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Teresina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuixeramobim
Death PlaceTeresina, Archdiocese of Teresina, Piaui
Buried Place (Original)Nossa Senhora do Carmo Chapel, Nossa Senhora das Dores, Cathedral, Teresina, Archdiocese of Teresina, Piaui

  • a priest for 69.5 years
  • a bishop for 48.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 28 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jun 2018

Quantcast