Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastião Bandeira Coêlho

Bishop of Coroatá, Maranho


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1959 BornRiação
28 Jul 198425.4Ordained PriestPriest of Balsas, Maranho, Brazil
22 Dec 200445.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil
22 Dec 200445.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thubursicum
12 Mar 200546.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thubursicum
6 Jan 201050.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Coroatá, Maranho, Brazil
16 Jan 201151.9SucceededBishop of Coroatá, Maranho, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Sebastião Bandeira Coêlho:
Bishop Sebastião Bandeira Coêlho (born ) Bishop of Coroatá

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Coroatá.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,836
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Jan 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015