Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Edmilson da Cruz

Bishop Emeritus of Limoeiro do Norte, Ceara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Oct 1924 BornAcaraú
5 Dec 194824.2Ordained PriestPriest
8 Aug 196641.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Maranho, Brazil
8 Aug 196641.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Vicus Caesaris
6 Nov 196642.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vicus Caesaris
3 Jul 197449.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil
18 May 199469.6AppointedBishop of Limoeiro do Norte, Ceara, Brazil
6 May 199873.6RetiredBishop of Limoeiro do Norte, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Manuel Edmilson da Cruz:
Bishop Manuel Edmilson da Cruz (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Limoeiro do Norte

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Limoeiro do Norte.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/ab: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 128

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013