Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Xavier Gilles de Maupeou d’Ableiges

Bishop Emeritus of Viana, Maranhão, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1935 Born
23 Dec 196126.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Le Mans, France
30 Jun 196227.2Ordained PriestPriest of Le Mans, France
2 Aug 199560.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
2 Aug 199560.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Casae Medianae
3 Sep 199560.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casae Medianae
18 Feb 199862.9AppointedBishop of Viana, Maranhão, Brazil
7 Jul 201075.3RetiredBishop of Viana, Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Xavier Gilles de Maupeou d’Ableiges
Bishop Xavier Gilles de Maupeou d’Ableiges (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Viana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaumur, France
Ordained DeaconSeminary St-Sulpice, Chapel, Issy-les-Moulineaux, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopSão José de Ribamar, Church, São Luís de Maranhão, Archdiocese of São Luís do Maranhão

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Viana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Jul 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,604
  • od/c0/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 9 Jul 2018

Quantcast