Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedito Francisco de Albuquerque

Bishop Emeritus of Itapipoca, Ceara, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1928 Born
8 Dec 195325.3Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jan 198556.4AppointedBishop of Itapipoca, Ceara, Brazil
5 May 198556.7Ordained BishopBishop of Itapipoca, Ceara, Brazil
25 May 200576.8RetiredBishop of Itapipoca, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Benedito Francisco de Albuquerque
Bishop Benedito Francisco de Albuquerque (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Itapipoca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoreau

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Itapipoca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast