Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vitório Pavanello, S.D.B.

Archbishop Emeritus of Campo Grande, Mato Grosso do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1936 BornPresidente Getúlio
31 Jul 196630.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
26 Nov 198145.8AppointedBishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
31 Jan 198246.0Ordained BishopBishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
26 Nov 198448.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Campo Grande, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
12 Dec 198650.8SucceededArchbishop of Campo Grande, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
4 May 201175.2RetiredArchbishop of Campo Grande, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Vitório Pavanello:
Archbishop Vitório Pavanello S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Campo Grande

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Campo Grande.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 May 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 22 Apr 2015