Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Virgílio de Pauli

Deceased

Bishop of Campo Mourão, Parana, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1923Born
8 Dec 195027.5Ordained PriestPriest of São Carlos, Sao Paulo, Brazil
8 May 198157.9AppointedBishop of Campo Mourão, Parana, Brazil
29 Jun 198158.0Ordained BishopBishop of Campo Mourão, Parana, Brazil
21 Feb 199975.7DiedBishop of Campo Mourão, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Virgílio de Pauli
Bishop Virgílio de Pauli (born , died ) Bishop of Campo Mourão

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAraraquara

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast