Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Pinarello de Almeida

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jundiaí, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1927BornAmparo
29 Jun 195224.5Ordained PriestPriest
18 Apr 197042.4AppointedBishop of Ilhéus, Bahia, Brazil
21 Jun 197042.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ilhéus, Bahia, Brazil
14 Jan 197143.1ResignedBishop of Ilhéus, Bahia, Brazil
24 Jul 197143.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jundiaí, Sao Paulo, Brazil
24 Jul 197143.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Byzacena
31 Jul 198052.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Jundiaí, Sao Paulo, Brazil
11 Mar 198254.3SucceededBishop of Jundiaí, Sao Paulo, Brazil
2 Oct 199668.8ResignedBishop of Jundiaí, Sao Paulo, Brazil
28 Jun 200274.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Jundiaí, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Roberto Pinarello de Almeida:
Bishop Roberto Pinarello de Almeida (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jundiaí

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Jun 2014