Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amaury Castanho

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jundiaí, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1927BornSousas
7 Oct 195124.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jul 197648.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sorocaba, Brazil
19 Jul 197648.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Balecium
7 Oct 197649.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Balecium
30 Nov 197952.2AppointedBishop of Valença, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
3 May 198961.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Jundiaí, Sao Paulo, Brazil
2 Oct 199669.0SucceededBishop of Jundiaí, Sao Paulo, Brazil
7 Jan 200476.3RetiredBishop of Jundiaí, Sao Paulo, Brazil
31 May 200678.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Jundiaí, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Amaury Castanho:
Bishop Amaury Castanho (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jundiaí

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013