Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Melas

Deceased

Bishop of Nuoro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1901Born
15 Aug 192624.8Ordained PriestPriest of Cagliari, Italy
31 Jan 194745.2AppointedBishop of Nuoro, Italy
13 Apr 194745.5Ordained BishopBishop of Nuoro, Italy
1 Jun 194745.6InstalledBishop of Nuoro, Italy
10 Sep 197068.9DiedBishop of Nuoro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Melas
Bishop Giuseppe Melas (born , died ) Bishop of Nuoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuasila, Archdiocese of Cagliari
Ordained PriestBeata Vergine Assunta, Church, Guasila, Archdiocese of Cagliari
Ordained BishopNostra Signora di Bonaria, Church, Cagliari, Archdiocese of Cagliari
Death PlaceNuoro, Diocese of Nuoro

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 23
  • c1/loc: CB, 20 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast