Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pablo Emiro Salas Anteliz

Archbishop of Barranquilla, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1957 Born
2 Dec 198427.4Ordained PriestPriest of Valledupar, Colombia
24 Oct 200750.3AppointedBishop of Espinal, Colombia
2 Dec 200750.4Ordained BishopBishop of Espinal, Colombia
15 Dec 200750.5InstalledBishop of Espinal, Colombia
18 Aug 201457.1AppointedBishop of Armenia, Colombia
11 Oct 201457.3InstalledBishop of Armenia, Colombia
14 Nov 201760.4AppointedArchbishop of Barranquilla, Colombia
9 Dec 201760.5InstalledArchbishop of Barranquilla, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Pablo Emiro Salas Anteliz
Archbishop Pablo Emiro Salas Anteliz (born ) Archbishop of Barranquilla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValledupar, Diocese of Valledupar
Ordained BishopColiseo Cubierto "Juan Monsalva Castilla", Valledupar, Diocese of Valledupar

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Barranquilla.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Oct 2007
  • ob/c1+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,572
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Aug 2014
  • i: CB, 20 Aug 2014
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2017
  • i: CB, 10 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast