Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Rabaul

Archidioecesis Rabaulensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Rochus Josef Tatamai, M.S.C., Archbishop
  • Karl Hesse, M.S.C., Archbishop Emeritus
  • Francesco Panfilo, S.D.B., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of New Britain
10 May 1889ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Melanesia
Vicariate Apostolic of Micronesia
Vicariate Apostolic of New Britain (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of New Pomerania
8 December 1890Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of New Britain Vicariate Apostolic of New Pomerania
27 July 1897Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of New Pomerania Prefecture Apostolic of English Solomon Islands (erected)
23 May 1898Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of New Pomerania Prefecture Apostolic of German Solomon Islands (erected)
20 September 1905Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of New Pomerania Vicariate Apostolic of Marshall Islands (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Rabaul
14 November 1922Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of New Pomerania Vicariate Apostolic of Rabaul
5 July 1957Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Rabaul Vicariate Apostolic of Kavieng (erected)
Archdiocese of Rabaul
15 November 1966ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Rabaul Archdiocese of Rabaul
4 July 2003Territory LostArchdiocese of Rabaul Diocese of Kimbe (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Rabaul
1970100,638150,00067.1%358611,64911122745ap1971
1980140,300205,00068.4%448522,6989222646ap1981
1990164,000269,00061.0%1450642,5627821675ap1991
1999221,300404,30054.7%2542673,3026914244ap2000
2000224,840411,79054.6%3138693,2588913144ap2001
2001227,250418,50054.3%2937663,4438812244ap2002
2002233,450419,45055.7%3036663,5378214144ap2003
2003110,000180,00061.1%189274,074381918ap2004
2004131,500235,60055.8%2227492,6839513529ap2005
2010149,870285,54052.5%3624602,4975113533ap2011
2014159,480308,60051.7%4719662,4164811735ap2015
2017155,407354,00443.9%4720672,3193812838ap2018

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast