Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George To Bata

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Rabaul, Papua New Guinea

Titular Bishop of Saia Maior


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1925Born
15 Nov 195328.2Ordained PriestPriest of Rabaul, Papua New Guinea
27 Apr 197852.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rabaul, Papua New Guinea
27 Apr 197852.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Saia Maior
15 Aug 197853.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Saia Maior
7 Mar 199569.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Rabaul, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for George To Bata
Bishop George To Bata (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Rabaul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMalagunan, Vicariate Apostolic of Rabaul
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Vunapope

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 54, Number 3,888

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast