Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Micronesia

Territory Lost

To: Vicariate Apostolic of Gilbert Islands {Isole Gilbert}



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
16 July 1844ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Western Oceania Vicariate Apostolic of Melanesia (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Micronesia (erected)
15 May 1886Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Micronesia
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Western Carolines
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Eastern Carolines (erected)
10 May 1889Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Melanesia
Vicariate Apostolic of Micronesia
Vicariate Apostolic of New Britain (erected)
28 June 1897Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Micronesia Vicariate Apostolic of Gilbert Islands {Isole Gilbert} (erected)

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 12 Apr 2021

Quantcast