Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerard Vesters, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Rabaul, Papua New Guinea

Titular Bishop of Diocletianopolis in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1876Born
28 Oct 190327.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
Dec 1919³43.2AppointedPrefect of Celebes, Indonesia
16 Feb 192346.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Diocletianopolis in Palaestina
16 Feb 192346.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of New Pomerania, Papua New Guinea
5 Aug 192346.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Diocletianopolis in Palaestina
14 Nov 192650.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Rabaul, Papua New Guinea
1939²62.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Rabaul, Papua New Guinea
30 Aug 195478.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Rabaul, Papua New Guinea

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gerard Vesters
Bishop Gerard Vesters M.S.C. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Rabaul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVucht, Netherlands

  • a priest for 50.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1923, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast