Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Brindisi-Ostuni

Archidioecesis Brundusina-Ostunensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Giovanni Intini, Archbishop
  • Domenico Caliandro, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Rocco Talucci, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Settimio Todisco, Archbishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Name Changed: 30 September 1986
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Lecce
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 1,254 (484 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Puglia
  • Official Web Site: http://www.brindisiostuni.chiesacattolica.it/
  • Mailing Address: Arcivescovado, Piazza Duomo 12, 72100 Brindisi, Italia
  • Telephone: 0831.52.19.58
  • Fax: 0831.52.83.15

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Brindisi
4th CenturyErectedDiocese of Brindisi (erected)
Archdiocese of Brindisi
10th CenturyElevatedDiocese of Brindisi Archdiocese of Brindisi
8 May 1591Territory LostArchdiocese of Brindisi Diocese of Oria (erected)
14 May 1821Territory AddedDiocese of Ostuni (suppressed) Archdiocese of Brindisi
20 October 1980ElevatedArchdiocese of Brindisi (no longer a metropolitan)
Archdiocese of Brindisi-Ostuni
30 September 1986Name ChangedArchdiocese of Brindisi Archdiocese of Brindisi-Ostuni

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Brindisi
188680,510.0%253018OTC
1948187,000188,00099.5%120261461,2803417533ap1951
1959226,065226,065100.0%112351471,5374028437ap1960
1970331,466332,01699.8%135361711,9384440748ap1971
1980269,790270,94399.6%132331651,6353736457ap1981
Archdiocese of Brindisi-Ostuni
1990274,584276,18499.4%128311591,72633527860ap1991
1999180,000281,14964.0%120321521,18483822861ap2000
2000227,841279,84181.4%121371581,44293821161ap2001
2001283,836285,83699.3%125391641,730104514561ap2002
2002290,000293,84998.7%120431631,779104720062ap2003
2003274,000276,72799.0%119351541,779104520061ap2004
2004291,000294,22098.9%121401611,80794420059ap2005
2006272,000274,32699.2%118361541,766134323059ap2007
2012281,593284,59398.9%126301561,805113618061ap2013
2015273,141276,60498.7%126341601,707143918460ap2016
2018265,560269,90098.4%119331521,747136614159ap2019
2020264,660269,00098.4%115311461,812114415660ap2021
2022259,400263,65098.4%113311441,801163814158ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Brindisi
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 862, to Page 863
    • Crontassi Iconografia ed Araldica dell'Episcopato Pugliese, Page 138, to Page 144
  • Archdiocese of Brindisi
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 149
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 111
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 141, and Page 142
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 122, and Page 123
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 128, and Page 129
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 132, and Page 133
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 72, Page 1,076, and Page 1,077
  • Archdiocese of Brindisi-Ostuni
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 79, Page 668, to Page 671

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024