Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan de Falces (de Santisteban y Falces), O.S.H. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Brindisi, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Jul 1605AppointedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
24 Jul 1605Ordained BishopArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
15 Oct 1636DiedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Juan de Falces (de Santisteban y Falces) (VIAF: 431159474047527660013)
Archbishop Juan de Falces (de Santisteban y Falces) O.S.H. (died ) Archbishop of Brindisi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAzanuy, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain
Ordained BishopSan Giacomo degli Spagnuoli, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceMadrid, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain
Buried Place (Original)Nuestra Señora de la Concepción de los franciscanos descalzos, Barajas, Archdiocese of Toledo, Spain

  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 122
  • b/c24: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1605, Number 7
  • c3: AT, 12 Mar 2017
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 231, Number 19,244
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Number 5,207

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast