Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Salvatore Palmieri, C.Pp.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Brindisi, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1827Born
24 Mar 185528.1Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Precious Blood
24 May 188962.3AppointedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
2 Jun 188962.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
24 Nov 1891³64.8ResignedArchbishop of Rossano, Italy
14 Dec 189164.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sardes
16 Jan 189365.9AppointedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy
7 Aug 190578.5DiedArchbishop of Brindisi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Salvatore Palmieri (VIAF: 89766340)
Archbishop Salvatore Palmieri C.Pp.S. (born , died ) Archbishop of Brindisi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBenevento, Archdiocese of Benevento
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Trivio ai Crociferi, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 160, and Page 501
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 485
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 28
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 34, Number 2,045

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast