Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Lecce

Archidioecesis Lyciensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Michele Seccia, Archbishop
  • Domenico Umberto D’Ambrosio, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 20 October 1980
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 750 (289 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Puglia
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesilecce.org/
  • Mailing Address: Palazzo Arcivescovile, Piazza Duomo 5, 73100 Lecce, Italia
  • Telephone: 0832.156.622
  • Fax: 0832.244.761

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Lecce
1057ErectedDiocese of Lecce (erected)
12 September 1960Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Lecce (from Otranto)
Archdiocese of Lecce
20 October 1980ElevatedDiocese of Lecce Archdiocese of Lecce
16 July 1988Territory AddedArchdiocese of Otranto (Presentazione del Signore (in Melendugno)) Archdiocese of Lecce

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Lecce
188680,357.0%430031OTC
1950163,000164,00099.4%1809027060317058039ap1951
1970225,274225,324100.0%155652201,0238356052ap1971
Archdiocese of Lecce
1980247,096247,177100.0%142712131,1609951965ap1981
1990265,376269,70898.4%148662141,24038642774ap1991
1999255,000257,80498.9%151552061,237257839376ap2000
2000266,000268,58099.0%151542051,297276735876ap2001
2001265,000267,22499.2%152602121,250307632476ap2002
2002274,770276,97999.2%153602131,290307532476ap2003
2003250,123252,92398.9%148602081,202317532476ap2004
2004258,225260,98898.9%140602001,291317433476ap2005
2013273,697274,51799.7%122581801,520387527777ap2014
2016295,280296,58099.6%115471621,822356324877ap2017
2019289,770291,30099.5%125581831,583346823077ap2020
2021269,390270,21099.7%124551791,504336520977ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Lecce
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 304, and Page 305
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 177
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 224, and Page 225
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 220
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 244
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 261
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 890
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 53, Page 345, and Page 346
  • Archdiocese of Lecce
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 72, Page 1,076, and Page 1,077
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 81, Page 107, and Page 108

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024