Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Satriano

Archbishop of Bari-Bitonto, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1960 Born
19 Apr 198423.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Brindisi, Italy
28 Sep 198525.0Ordained PriestPriest of Brindisi, Italy
15 Jul 201453.8AppointedArchbishop of Rossano-Cariati, Italy
3 Oct 201454.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Rossano-Cariati, Italy
25 Oct 201454.1InstalledArchbishop of Rossano-Cariati, Italy
29 Oct 202060.1AppointedArchbishop of Bari-Bitonto, Italy
21 Dec 202060.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Rossano-Cariati, Italy
25 Jan 202160.3InstalledArchbishop of Bari-Bitonto, Italy
12 Jun 202160.7CeasedApostolic Administrator of Rossano-Cariati, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Satriano
Archbishop Giuseppe Satriano (born ) Archbishop of Bari-Bitonto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrindisi, Archdiocese of Brindisi
Ordained BishopCathedral, Brindisi, Archdiocese of Brindisi-Ostuni

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bari-Bitonto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2014
  • od/c01: CB, 19 Jul 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 27 Jul 2014
  • c34: CB, 20 Sep 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,302
  • ab: Bollettino, 29 Oct 2020
  • i: CB, 24 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 12 Jun 2021

Quantcast