Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Edmund Pates

Bishop Emeritus of Des Moines, Iowa, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1943 Born
20 Dec 196825.8Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
22 Dec 200057.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
22 Dec 200057.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Suacia
26 Mar 200158.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Suacia
10 Apr 200865.1AppointedBishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA
29 May 200865.2InstalledBishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA
18 Jul 201976.4RetiredBishop of Des Moines, Iowa, USA
27 Dec 201976.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Joliet in Illinois, USA
29 Sep 202077.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Joliet in Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Richard Edmund Pates
Bishop Richard Edmund Pates (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Des Moines

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Paul, Archdiocese of Saint Paul, Minnesota
Ordained BishopSaint Paul, Cathedral, Saint Paul, Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Des Moines.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Apr 2008
  • i: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,948
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Jul 2019
  • ab: CB, 27 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast