Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Harry Joseph Flynn

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1933Born
28 May 196027.0Ordained PriestPriest of Albany, New York, USA
19 Apr 198652.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA
24 Jun 198653.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA
13 May 198956.0SucceededBishop of Lafayette, Louisiana, USA
22 Feb 199460.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
24 Apr 199460.9InstalledCoadjutor Archbishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
8 Sep 199562.3SucceededArchbishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
2 May 200875.0RetiredArchbishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA
22 Sep 201986.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA

MicroData Summary for Harry Joseph Flynn
Archbishop Harry Joseph Flynn (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Saint Paul and Minneapolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchenectady, NY
Death PlaceSt. Paul, Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota
Buried Place (Original)Resurrection, Cemetery, Mendota Heights, MN, Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 May 2008
  • d: CB, 23 Sep 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast