Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Howard James Hubbard

Bishop Emeritus of Albany, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1938 Born
18 Dec 196325.1Ordained PriestPriest of Albany, New York, USA
1 Feb 197738.2AppointedBishop of Albany, New York, USA
27 Mar 197738.4Ordained BishopBishop of Albany, New York, USA
11 Feb 201475.2RetiredBishop of Albany, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Howard James Hubbard
Bishop Howard James Hubbard (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Albany

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTroy
Ordained BishopSierra College, Londonville, Diocese of Albany, New York

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Albany.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 41, Number 2,658
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 81, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 2 Dec 2020

Quantcast