Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francis Joseph Cardinal Spellman

Deceased

Archbishop of New York, New York, USA

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo

Vicar Apostolic of Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1889Born
14 May 191627.0Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
30 Jul 193243.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
30 Jul 193243.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sila
8 Sep 193243.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sila
15 Apr 193949.9AppointedArchbishop of New York, New York, USA
25 Nov 193950.5AppointedOrdinary of Military, USA
18 Feb 194656.7Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 194656.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
8 Sep 195768.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Military, USA
2 Dec 196778.5DiedArchbishop of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Joseph Spellman (VIAF: 27087364)
Francis Joseph Cardinal Spellman (born , died ) Archbishop of New York

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWhitman, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceNew York, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 35.2 years
  • a cardinal for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1932, Number 61
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 450, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 669, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 987, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,101, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Mar 2021

Quantcast