Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
2 May 1974 | Born | ||
25 May 2002 | 28.0 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA |
10 Dec 2021 | 47.6 | Appointed | Auxiliary Bishop of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota, USA |
10 Dec 2021 | 47.6 | Appointed | Titular Bishop of Idassa |
25 Jan 2022 | 47.7 | Ordained Bishop | Titular Bishop of Idassa |
(WikiData: Q110042266)
Bishop
Joseph Andrew
Williams
(born )
Auxiliary Bishop
of Saint Paul and Minneapolis
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Minneapolis, Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota |
Ordained Priest | St. Paul, Cathedral, St. Paul, Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota |
Ordained Bishop | St. Paul, Cathedral, St. Paul, Archdiocese of Saint Paul and Minneapolis, Minnesota |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠