Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Fabrizio Cardinal Paolucci

Deceased

Secretary of State

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Vicar General of Roma {Rome}

Secretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1651Born
9 Apr 168534.0AppointedBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
6 May 168534.0Ordained BishopBishop of Macerata e Tolentino, Italy
20 Feb 169644.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
22 Jul 169746.3Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
27 Jan 169846.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Ferrara, Italy
Feb 1698³46.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
19 Dec 169847.7Elevated to Cardinal
5 Jan 169947.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
3 Dec 170049.6AppointedSecretary of State
14 Mar 170149.9ResignedBishop of Ferrara, Italy
25 Jan 170957.8AppointedPro-Major Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
28 Jun 171059.2AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
8 Feb 171967.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
19 Mar 172169.9ResignedSecretary of State
11 May 172170.1AppointedVicar General of Roma {Rome}, Italy
9 Sep 172170.4AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
6 Jun 172473.1AppointedSecretary of State
12 Jun 172473.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
1725²73.7AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Universal Inquisition
19 Nov 172574.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
12 Jun 172675.1DiedSecretary of State

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fabrizio Paolucci (VIAF: 29524618)
Fabrizio Cardinal Paolucci (born , died ) Secretary of State

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForlì, Diocese of Forli, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Filippo, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Pellegrino Laziosi Chapel, S. Marcello, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 41.0 years
  • a cardinal for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Jul 1697
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 8
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 255
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 336, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 453, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 476, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 563, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 622, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 849, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,017, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 10 Jan 2021

Quantcast