Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Giuseppe Arborio di Gattinara, B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1658Born
1676²17.9EnteredMember of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
21 Feb 168224.1Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular of St. Paul
7 Jun 170648.4AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
13 Jun 170648.4Ordained BishopBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
11 Jun 172769.4SelectedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
25 Jun 172769.4ConfirmedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
14 Oct 174385.7DiedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Giuseppe Arborio di Gattinara (VIAF: 90371287)
Archbishop Francesco Giuseppe Arborio di Gattinara B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Torino {Turin}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGravellona Lomellina, Diocese of Novara
Ordained BishopSan Carlo ai Catinari, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Cathedral, Torino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}

  • a priest for 61.6 years
  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 77, and Page 370
  • ob/c2: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 7
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 61, Number 4,628
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 68, Number 5,332
  • ob/c2: AT, 8 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast