Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Anguisciola

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1643Born
25 Jun 170662.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
18 Jul 170662.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Larissa in Thessalia
10 Nov 170662.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
18 Aug 170763.7DiedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Anguisciola
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Anguisciola (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Venice

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiacenza, Diocese of Piacenza
Ordained BishopSant’Ignazio, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 237
  • ob/c2: CB, 21 Dec 2013
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 9
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 231
  • ob.loc: CB, 21 Apr 2021
  • ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 248, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Aug 2021

Quantcast