Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gasparo Cardinal Carpegna

Deceased

Prefect of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina

Prefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1625Born
16 Jun 167045.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
22 Jun 167045.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
22 Dec 167045.6Elevated to Cardinal
23 Feb 167145.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
18 Mar 167145.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
14 Nov 167247.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
10 Jan 167549.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars
19 Oct 168964.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
27 Jan 169872.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
6 Apr 171488.9DiedPrefect of the Congregation of Bishops and Regulars

MicroData Summary for Gasparo Carpegna (VIAF: 73844165)
Gasparo Cardinal Carpegna (born , died ) Prefect of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopS. Silvestre in Capite, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 43.7 years
  • a cardinal for 43.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 22 Dec 1670
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1670, Number 10
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 336, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 453, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 476, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 563, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 622, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 849, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,017, Ascendance
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 72, Number 5,712

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast