Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonaventura Martinelli

Deceased

Bishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1639³Born
4 Oct 169556.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Oct 169556.5Ordained PriestPriest
21 Nov 170162.7AppointedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
27 Nov 170162.7Ordained BishopBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy
Aug 1715³76.4DiedBishop of Valva e Sulmona, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bonaventura Martinelli (VIAF: 89641234)
Bishop Bonaventura Martinelli (born , died Aug 1715) Bishop of Valva e Sulmona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVallo di Nera, Diocese of Spoleto
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Vallicella, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRoccaraso, Diocese of Valva e Sulmona
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Sulmona, Diocese of Valva e Sulmona

  • a priest for 19.8 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 404
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1701, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast