Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ferdinando Cardinal Nuzzi

Deceased

Bishop of Orvieto, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1645Born
7 Jun 170660.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
13 Jun 170660.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Nicaea
16 Dec 171570.2Elevated to Cardinal
5 Feb 171670.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
30 Mar 171670.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Orvieto, Italy
1 Dec 171772.2DiedBishop of Orvieto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Nuzzi (VIAF: 9410641)
Ferdinando Cardinal Nuzzi (born , died ) Bishop of Orvieto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrte, Diocese of Civita Castellana e Orte
Ordained BishopSan Carlo ai Catinari, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceOrviteo, Diocese of Orvieto
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Orviteo, Diocese of Orvieto

  • a bishop for 11.4 years
  • a cardinal for 1.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1715
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 287, and Page 398
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 23
  • ob/c2: AT, 8 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 20 Dec 2020

Quantcast