Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Adinolfi

Deceased

Bishop of Andria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1647Born
23 Dec 169043.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 Dec 169043.4Ordained PriestPriest
6 Dec 170659.3AppointedBishop of Andria, Italy
16 Jan 170759.4Ordained BishopBishop of Andria, Italy
13 Jul 171567.9DiedBishop of Andria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Adinolfi
Bishop Nicola Adinolfi (born , died ) Bishop of Andria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Ordained Bishopde Crociferi, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceAndria, Diocese of Andria
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Andria, Diocese of Andria

  • a priest for 24.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 85
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 33
  • ob/c2/d/loc: AT, 20 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 21 Apr 2021

Quantcast