Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan del Río Martín

Deceased

Archbishop of Spain, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Oct 1947Born
2 Feb 197426.3Ordained PriestPriest of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
29 Jun 200052.7AppointedBishop of Jerez de la Frontera, Spain
23 Sep 200052.9Ordained BishopBishop of Jerez de la Frontera, Spain
30 Jun 200860.7AppointedArchbishop of Spain, Military
28 Jan 202173.2DiedArchbishop of Spain, Military

MicroData Summary for Juan del Río Martín (VIAF: 7552670)
Archbishop Juan del Río Martín (born , died ) Archbishop of Spain, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAyamonte
Ordained BishopSalvador, Cathedral, Jerez de la Frontera, Diocese of Jerez de la Frontera
Death PlaceCentral de la Defensa Gómez Ulla, Hospital, Madrid, Archdiocese of Madrid

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,842
  • d: CB, 28 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 27 Jan 2021; Data: 28 Jan 2021

Quantcast