Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Sánchez Monge

Bishop Emeritus of Santander, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1947 Born
9 Aug 197023.3Ordained PriestPriest of Palencia, Spain
6 Jun 200558.1AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo-Ferrol, Spain
23 Jul 200558.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo-Ferrol, Spain
6 May 201568.0AppointedBishop of Santander, Spain
30 May 201568.1InstalledBishop of Santander, Spain
31 Oct 202376.5RetiredBishop of Santander, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Sánchez Monge
(VIAF: 86816096; WikiData: Q1454351)
Bishop Manuel Sánchez Monge (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Santander

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFuentes de Nava, Diocese of Palencia
Ordained BishopPlaza, Cathedral, Mondoñedo, Diocese of Mondoñedo-Ferrol

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santander.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 181, Number 14,949
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 May 2015
  • i: CB, 6 May 2015
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 31 Oct 2023