Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Mazuelos Pérez

Bishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1960 Born
17 Mar 199029.4Ordained PriestPriest of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
19 Mar 200948.4AppointedBishop of Jerez de la Frontera, Spain
6 Jun 200948.6Ordained BishopBishop of Jerez de la Frontera, Spain
6 Jul 202059.7AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
2 Oct 202059.9InstalledBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Mazuelos Pérez (VIAF: 2290953)
Bishop José Mazuelos Pérez (born ) Bishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOsuna, Archdiocese of Sevilla {Seville}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Jerez de la Frontera, Diocese of Jerez de la Frontera

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,184
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Jul 2020
  • i: AM, 5 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast