Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Celestino Migliore

Apostolic Nuncio to France

Titular Archbishop of Canosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1952 Born
25 Jun 197724.9Ordained PriestPriest of Cuneo, Italy
14 Apr 199239.7AppointedPermanent Observer to Council of Europe
21 Dec 199543.4AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
30 Oct 200250.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Canosa
30 Oct 200250.3AppointedPermanent Observer to United Nations
6 Jan 200350.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Canosa
30 Jun 201057.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Poland
28 May 201663.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Russian Federation
21 Jan 201764.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Uzbekistan
11 Jan 202067.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France

MicroData Summary for Celestino Migliore (VIAF: 81097911)
Archbishop Celestino Migliore (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of France

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuneo, Diocese of Cuneo, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to France.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,301
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 May 2016
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Jan 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Feb 2021

Quantcast