Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mirosław Milewski

Auxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland

Titular Bishop of Villa Nova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1971 Born
14 Jun 199726.3Ordained PriestPriest of Płock, Poland
23 Jan 201644.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland
23 Jan 201644.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Villa Nova
27 Feb 201645.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Villa Nova

MicroData Summary for Mirosław Milewski
Bishop Mirosław Milewski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Płock

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCiechanów
Ordained BishopCathedral Basilica, Płock, Diocese of Płock

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Płock.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 Jan 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,851

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast