Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Damian Bryl

Bishop of Kalisz, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1969 Born
26 May 199425.2Ordained PriestPriest of Poznań, Poland
13 Jul 201344.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland
13 Jul 201344.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Suliana
8 Sep 201344.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Suliana
25 Jan 202151.9AppointedBishop of Kalisz, Poland
11 Feb 202152.0InstalledBishop of Kalisz, Poland

MicroData Summary for Damian Bryl
Bishop Damian Bryl (born ) Bishop of Kalisz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJarocin
Ordained BishopCathedral, Poznań, Archdiocese of Poznań

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kalisz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Jul 2013
  • c34: CB, 27 Aug 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,866
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2021
  • i: AM, 5 Feb 2021
  • i: CB, 8 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Feb 2021

Quantcast