Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Salvador Marino

President of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

Titular Archbishop of Natchitoches


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1953 Born
25 Aug 197926.5Ordained PriestPriest of Birmingham, Alabama, USA
12 Jan 200854.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bangladesh
12 Jan 200854.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Natchitoches
29 Mar 200855.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Natchitoches
16 Jan 201359.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Malaysia
16 Jan 201359.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Timor-Leste
16 Jan 201359.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Brunei Darussalam
11 Oct 201966.7AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

MicroData Summary for Joseph Salvador Marino
Archbishop Joseph Salvador Marino (born ) President of Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBirmingham, Diocese of Birmingham, Alabama, USA
Ordained BishopSaint Paul, Cathedral, Birmingham, Diocese of Birmingham, Alabama, USA

Please contact the Archbishop through the Pontifical Ecclesiastical Academy.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,693
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Jan 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 19 Feb 2021

Quantcast