Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Joseph McManus

Bishop of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA

Apostolic Administrator of Springfield in Massachusetts


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1951 Born
27 May 197826.8Ordained PriestPriest of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
1 Dec 199847.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
1 Dec 199847.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Allegheny
22 Feb 199947.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Allegheny
9 Mar 200452.6AppointedBishop of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA
14 May 200452.8InstalledBishop of Worcester, Massachusetts, USA
25 Aug 202069.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
14 Dec 202069.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Joseph McManus
Bishop Robert Joseph McManus (born ) Bishop of Worcester

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWarwick
Ordained BishopSts. Peter and Paul, Cathedral, Providence, Diocese of Providence, Rhode Island

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Worcester.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,484
  • ab: CB, 25 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast