Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Raffaele Carlo Cardinal Rossi, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Secretary of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1876Born
19 Dec 189923.1ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
21 Dec 190125.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
22 Apr 192043.4AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
25 May 192043.5Ordained BishopBishop of Volterra, Italy
1 Jun 192346.5AppointedOfficial of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation
20 Dec 192347.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
30 Jun 193053.6Elevated to Cardinal
3 Jul 193053.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
4 Jul 193053.6AppointedSecretary of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation
17 Sep 194871.8DiedSecretary of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Carlo Rossi (VIAF: 75106767)
Raffaele Carlo Cardinal Rossi O.C.D. (born , died ) Secretary of Sacred Consistorial Congregation

EventPlace
Birth PlacePisa

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
  • a cardinal for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1920, Number 27
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 253, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 260, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 339, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 367, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 405, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 481, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 522, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 617, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 668, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 737, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 859, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,018, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,127, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast