Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Moses Elias Kiley

Deceased

Archbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1876Born
10 Jun 191134.5Ordained PriestPriest of Chicago, Illinois, USA
10 Feb 193457.2AppointedBishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA
17 Mar 193457.3Ordained BishopBishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA
1 Jan 194063.1AppointedArchbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA
15 Apr 195376.4DiedArchbishop of Milwaukee, Wisconsin, USA

MicroData Summary for Moses Elias Kiley (VIAF: 31546366)
Archbishop Moses Elias Kiley (born , died ) Archbishop of Milwaukee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMargaree, Cape Breton Island, Canada

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1934, Number 19
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 532, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast