Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kenneth Anthony Angell

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Burlington, Vermont, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1930Born
26 May 195625.8Ordained PriestPriest of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
9 Aug 197444.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
9 Aug 197444.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Septimunicia
7 Oct 197444.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Septimunicia
6 Oct 199262.1AppointedBishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA
9 Nov 199262.2InstalledBishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA
9 Nov 200575.2RetiredBishop of Burlington, Vermont, USA
4 Oct 201686.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Burlington, Vermont, USA

MicroData Summary for Kenneth Anthony Angell
Bishop Kenneth Anthony Angell (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Burlington

EventPlace
Birth PlaceProvidence, Diocese of Providence, Rhode Island
Ordained PriestSts. Peter and Paul, Cathedral, Providence, Diocese of Providence, Rhode Island
Ordained BishopSts. Peter and Paul, Cathedral, Providence, Diocese of Providence, Rhode Island

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 41.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Nov 2005
  • d: CB, 5 Oct 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 26, Number 1,497

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast