Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gaetano Cardinal De Lai

Deceased

Bishop of Poggio Mirteto, Italy

Cardinal-Bishop of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto

Secretary of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1853Born
16 Apr 187622.7Ordained PriestPriest of Vicenza, Italy
19 Jun 190349.8AppointedPro-Secretary of the Congregation of the Council
11 Nov 190350.2AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Council
16 Dec 190754.3Elevated to Cardinal
19 Dec 190754.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Nicola in Carcere
20 Oct 190855.2AppointedSecretary of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation
27 Nov 191158.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
17 Dec 191158.3Ordained BishopCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
7 Aug 192471.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Poggio Mirteto, Italy
3 Jun 192571.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto
24 Oct 192875.2DiedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina e Poggio Mirteto

MicroData Summary for Gaetano De Lai (VIAF: 13365130)
Gaetano Cardinal De Lai (born , died ) Bishop of Poggio Mirteto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMalo

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
  • a cardinal for 20.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1911, Number 100
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 253, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 260, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 339, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 367, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 9, Number 405, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 481, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 522, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 12, Number 617, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 668, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 737, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 859, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 19, Number 1,018, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 20, Number 1,127, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 13 Apr 2021

Quantcast