Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Odore Joseph Gendron

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1921Born
31 May 194725.7Ordained PriestPriest of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
12 Dec 197453.2AppointedBishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
3 Feb 197553.3Ordained BishopBishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
12 Jun 199068.7ResignedBishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
16 Oct 202099.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA

MicroData Summary for Odore Joseph Gendron
Bishop Odore Joseph Gendron (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Manchester

EventPlace
Birth PlaceManchester, Diocese of Manchester, New Hampshire
Ordained BishopSt. Joseph, Cathedral, Manchester, Diocese of Manchester, New Hampshire
Death PlaceMount Carmel Rehabilitation and Nursing Center, Manchester, Diocese of Manchester, New Hampshire
Buried Place (Original)Bishops' Cemetery, Cathedral, Manchester, Diocese of Manchester, New Hampshire

  • a priest for 73.3 years
  • a bishop for 45.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 29, Number 1,652
  • d: CB, 17 Oct 2020
  • d: CB, 19 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast