Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesus Yu Varela

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sorsogon, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1927Born
17 Mar 195628.2Ordained PriestPriest
28 Mar 196739.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zamboanga, Philippines
28 Mar 196739.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tatilti
30 Apr 196739.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tatilti
17 Feb 197143.1AppointedBishop of Ozamis, Philippines
27 Nov 198052.9AppointedBishop of Sorsogon, Philippines
16 Apr 200375.3RetiredBishop of Sorsogon, Philippines
23 Feb 201890.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Sorsogon, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Jesus Yu Varela
Bishop Jesus Yu Varela (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sorsogon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBacolod
Ordained PriestCebu
Ordained BishopNaga
Death PlaceSan Juan de Dios, Hospital, Pasay City, Archdiocese of Manila

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 50.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • mn: CB, 26 Jul 2015
  • d: CB, 22 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast